SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Green et al
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Wolf Creek, LLC, Green & Sons, LLC, LBG, LLC, Coastal Commercial, LLC, Jeff Green and Kirby Green Northcutt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00430
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 09/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kirby Green Northcutt, LBG, LLC, Jeff Green. Plaintiff Response due by 10/10/2019. Defendants Replies due by 10/17/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 09/19/2019. (nah)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Wolf Creek, LLC. (Jackson, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Coastal Commercial, LLC. (Jackson, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Dismiss and REFERRAL OF #18 Memorandum in Support to Judge Murray. (nah)
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeff Green, LBG, LLC, Kirby Green Northcutt. (Crawford, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeff Green, LBG, LLC, Kirby Green Northcutt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Crawford, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Green & Sons, LLC (nah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against Green & Sons, LLC . (Fontenot, Gilbert)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants, except for Green & Sons, LLC, shall file their answer or otherwise respond on or before September 19, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/28/2019. (khc)
August 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 08/27/2019. (nah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Coastal Commercial, LLC, Jeff Green, LBG, LLC, Kirby Green Northcutt, Wolf Creek, LLC. (Jackson, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael A. Crawford to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael A. Crawford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2465011, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Jeff Green, LBG, LLC, Kirby Green Northcutt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Crawford, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. LBG, LLC served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement certified mail receipt) (Fontenot, Gilbert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Kirby Green Northcutt served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement certified mail receipt) (Fontenot, Gilbert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Wolf Creek, LLC served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement certified mail receipt) (Fontenot, Gilbert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Jeff Green served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement certified mail receipt) (Fontenot, Gilbert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Coastal Commercial, LLC served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement certified mail receipt) (Fontenot, Gilbert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Green & Sons, LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement certified mail receipt) (Fontenot, Gilbert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Gaal on behalf of SE Property Holdings, LLC (Gaal, Richard)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coastal Commercial, LLC, Jeff Green, Green & Sons, LLC, LBG, LLC, Kirby Green Northcutt, Wolf Creek, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by SE Property Holdings, LLC (Fontenot, Gilbert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coastal Commercial, LLC, Jeff Green, Green & Sons, LLC, LBG, LLC, Kirby Green Northcutt, Wolf Creek, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2443520, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Fontenot, Gilbert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolf Creek, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green & Sons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBG, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Represented By: Michael Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Commercial, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Green
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Represented By: Michael Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Green Northcutt
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Represented By: Michael Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Gilbert L. Fontenot
Represented By: Richard M. Gaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?