Blackwell v. Gulf Coast Express Carriers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dee Blackwell
Defendant: Gulf Coast Express Carriers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00433
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dee Blackwell. Gulf Coast Express Carriers, Inc. waiver sent on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Evans, Daniel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dee Blackwell. Gulf Coast Express Carriers, Inc. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019 (Evans, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gulf Coast Express Carriers, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gulf Coast Express Carriers, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2445066, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Dee Blackwell. (Evans, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell v. Gulf Coast Express Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Blackwell
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Express Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?