Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC, et al. v. Jubilant Draximage Inc.
Plaintiff: Cox Nuclear Pharmacy, UPPI, LLC and Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC
Defendant: Jubilant Draximage Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00518
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #25 Disclosure Statement filed by Jubilant Draximage Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/7/2019. (ctn)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/3/19. (Nelson, Katherine)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION and APPLICATION for Adam Seth Proujansky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number BALSDC-2485640, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Jubilant Draximage Inc. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (srd)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Jubilant Draximage Inc.. (Mattei, Blair)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline and Setting Briefing Schedule, as follows: The deadline for the Defendant to file and serve its answer under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1)(A) is hereby extended to Tues. 11/5/2019. The Court declines to enter the parties' proposed briefing schedule for any Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) motions to dismiss. The Court will set a briefing schedule it deems appropriate if and when any such motion is file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/3/2019. (ctn)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline and Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Jubilant Draximage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Mattei, Blair)
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair G. Mattei on behalf of Jubilant Draximage Inc. (Mattei, Blair)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Upchurch on behalf of Jubilant Draximage Inc. (Upchurch, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/26/19. (Nelson, Katherine)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jeffrey S. Jacobovitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2465016, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC, UPPI, LLC. (Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2019 Answer due from Jubilant Draximage Inc. on 9/5/2019 pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (srr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Class Action Complaint served on Jubilant DraxImage, Inc. accepted by Amy Taylor, Executive Assistant to CEO Pramond Yadov on August 16, 2019, filed by Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC. (McDonald, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 #12 #13 #14 Motions for Jay Leslie Himes, Christopher John McDonald, Robin Ann van der Meulen, and Jonathan Scott Crevier to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/20/2019. (ctn)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #15 Disclosure Statement filed by Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/20/2019. (ctn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC. (McCoy, Douglas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jonathan Scott Crevier to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2460337, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC. (Crevier, Jonathan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION and APPLICATION for Robin Ann van der Meulen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2460331, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC. (Van der Meulen, Robin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION and APPLICATION for Christopher John McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2460325, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC. (McDonald, Christopher)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jay Leslie Himes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2460321, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC. (Himes, Jay)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/14/19. (srr)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Wed. 8/21/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/14/2019. (ctn)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #4 Disclosure Statement filed by UPPI, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/14/2019. (ctn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Service Notice entered 8/13/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 9/26/2019. (srr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jubilant Draximage Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff UPPI, LLC. (McCoy, Douglas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document Unredacted Complaint filed by Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC, UPPI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCoy, Douglas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jubilant Draximage Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2453418, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC, UPPI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (McCoy, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC, et al. v. Jubilant Draximage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Nuclear Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPPI, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Jacobovitz
Represented By: Douglas L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ionsouth-Mobile, LLC
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Jonathan S. Crevier
Represented By: Christopher J. McDonald
Represented By: Robin A. Van der Meulen
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Jacobovitz
Represented By: Douglas L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jubilant Draximage Inc.
Represented By: Adam Seth Proujansky
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Represented By: Blair G. Mattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?