Campbell v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reco Jermaine Campbell
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00535
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (jlr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Randall Little on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Little, Jonathan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Keith Essig on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Essig, Brandon)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01598. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/14/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/15/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/15/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than July 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to showcause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/4/19.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/15/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/15/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/15/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/15/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7439939) filed by Reco Jermaine Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Reco Jermaine Campbell(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: Brandon Keith Essig
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Brandon Keith Essig
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reco Jermaine Campbell
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?