Jaxon Energy, LLC v. Hargrove and Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jaxon Energy, LLC
Defendant: Hargrove and Associates Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00552
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #28 Motion for Extension of Time. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/9/2019. (bld)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #26 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys David Ronald Musgrove and Michael S. Smith, II terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/9/2019. (bld)
October 9, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ernest Glenn Smith, Jr on behalf of Jaxon Energy, LLC (Smith, Ernest)
October 8, 2019 MOTION (SEE DOC. #28 FOR PLEADING) for Extension of Time filed by Hargrove and Associates Inc. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins 10/8/19. (mpp)
October 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #27 Response to Order to Show Cause & #28 Response to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
October 8, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #26 MOTION to Substitute Attorney - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mpp)
October 8, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #25 Order to Show Cause and Motion for an Enlargment of Time filed by Hargrove and Associates Inc. (Rafferty, Loren)
October 8, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #25 Order to Show Cause filed by Jaxon Energy, LLC. (Pryor, Caroline)
October 7, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Jaxon Energy, LLC. (Pryor, Caroline)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The parties are ORDERED to show cause, by October 8, 2019, why they failed to file the joint Rule 26(f) report as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/2/19. (mpp) Copies to counsel
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Loren A. Rafferty is substituted for attorney James W. Shelson as counsel for Defendant Hargrove and Associates, Inc. Attorney James W. Shelson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/1/2019. (bld)
September 26, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Hargrove and Associates Inc. (Rafferty, Loren)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 08/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (srd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00207. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Change Venue This case is transferred to the Southern District of Alabama, Southern Division. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/14/2019 (cwl) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Change Venue , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Hargrove and Associates, Inc. (Graham, Allen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Jaxon Energy, LLC.(Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Jaxon Energy, LLC (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Jaxon Energy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EPCM Master Agreement)(Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Continue Rule 16 TCMC. The TCMC previously scheduled for 6/5/2019 is continued pending the Court's ruling on the Motion to Change Venue #9 . Counsel is instructed to contact the undersigned's chambers within seven days of the Court's ruling on Motion #9 to set a new date for the TCMC if necessary. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/29/19 (RBM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
May 24, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Change Venue. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before June 4, 2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on May 24, 2019. (DI) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #8 Rule 16(a)Initial Order, by Hargrove and Associates, Inc. (Graham, Allen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Change Venue by Jaxon Energy, LLC (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Smith, II on behalf of Jaxon Energy, LLC (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jaxon Energy, LLC by Hargrove and Associates, Inc..(Graham, Allen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Hargrove and Associates, Inc. (Graham, Allen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue by Hargrove and Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Jackson)(Graham, Allen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Hargrove and Associates, Inc..(Graham, Allen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hargrove and Associates, Inc. (Graham, Allen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen E. Graham on behalf of Hargrove and Associates, Inc. (Graham, Allen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hargrove and Associates, Inc. answer due 4/30/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/17/19 (RBM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hargrove and Associates, Inc. (Shelson, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jaxon Energy, LLC. Hargrove and Associates, Inc. served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hargrove and Associates, Inc. (VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hargrove and Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 34643054207), filed by Jaxon Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Master Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Operations Support Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaxon Energy, LLC v. Hargrove and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hargrove and Associates Inc
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: James W Shelson
Represented By: Loren Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaxon Energy, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Smith, II
Represented By: David Ronald Musgrove
Represented By: Ernest Glenn Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?