Turley v. South Baldwin Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Turley
Defendant: Community Health Systems, Inc. and South Baldwin Regional Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv00558
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/18/19. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Community Health Systems, Inc., South Baldwin Regional Medical Center. (Stewart, Charles)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: Stipulation of Dismissal #8 that the court is construing as a motion to voluntary dismiss filed by South Baldwin Regional Medical Center, plaintiff's claims against defendant Community Health Systems Inc are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/16/19. (srr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Agreed Order of Dismissal by South Baldwin Regional Medical Center. (Stewart, Charles)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda Turley. Community Health Systems, Inc. served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019 (Loper, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda Turley. South Baldwin Regional Medical Center served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019 (Loper, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Service Notice entered 8/23/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 10/4/2019 (srr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Community Health Systems, Inc., South Baldwin Regional Medical Center. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Rhonda Turley (Loper, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2462076, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Rhonda Turley. (Loper, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srr). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/23/2019) (srr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turley v. South Baldwin Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A. Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Baldwin Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Charles A. Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Turley
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?