Massey v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James Benjamin Massey
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00569
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00035. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/21/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. filed by James Benjamin Massey.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Belo Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/22/2019. (mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Belo Complaint by James Benjamin Massey. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Exhibit B- First Amended Belo Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Nathan) Modified referral on 7/21/2019 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 30, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/2/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7336685) filed by James Benjamin Massey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party James Benjamin Massey(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Benjamin Massey
Represented By: Craig Thomas Downs
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?