Norris et al v. Darwin National Assurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Norris and Clarke County Commission
Defendant: Darwin National Assurance Co. and Barbara Donald
Case Number: 1:2019cv00576
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Response in Support of Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Co.. (Wall, Jennifer)
October 7, 2019 REFERRAL OF #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 Response to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred L. Clements on behalf of Clarke County Commission, Tyler Norris (Clements, Fred)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clarke County Commission, Tyler Norris. (Clements, Fred)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barbara Donald. (DiGiorgio, George)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Co. Responses due by 10/4/2019 Replies due by 10/18/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 10/21/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 9/13/19. (cmj)
September 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
September 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #8 Memorandum in Support to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
September 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #6 Notice of Filing Exhibits, #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Co.. (Wall, Jennifer)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darwin National Assurance Co.. (Wall, Jennifer)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits regarding Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support by Darwin National Assurance Co. (Wall, Jennifer)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Darwin National Assurance Co. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Darwin National Assurance Co. on 9/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 08/28/2019. (jil)
August 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Darwin National Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wall, Jennifer)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Darwin National Assurance Co., Allied World identifying Corporate Parent Allied World for Darwin National Assurance Co... (Wall, Jennifer)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Darwin National Assurance Co. from Circuit Court of Clarke County, Alabama, case number 16-cv-2019-900112. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2463719, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Darwin National Assurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Wall, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris et al v. Darwin National Assurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Norris
Represented By: Matthew Cory Drinkard
Represented By: Kendrick E. Webb
Represented By: Fred L. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarke County Commission
Represented By: Matthew Cory Drinkard
Represented By: Kendrick E. Webb
Represented By: Fred L. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darwin National Assurance Co.
Represented By: Elliott Britton Monroe
Represented By: Jennifer W. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Donald
Represented By: George Richard DiGiorgio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?