Morris Bart, LLC et al v. Gordon et al
Plaintiff: Morris Bart, LLC and Morris Bart & Associates, LLC
Defendant: James O. Gordon and Alabama Pain and Injury Clinic, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00580
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #11 , #12 Amended Disclosure Statements filed by Morris Bart, LLC and Morris Bart & Associates, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/18/2019. (ctn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Morris Bart & Associates, LLC. (Jackson, J.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Morris Bart, LLC. (Jackson, J.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #8 , #9 Disclosure Statements filed by Morris Bart, LLC and Morris Bart & Associates, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/12/2019. (ctn)
September 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Response to Court Order to Judge Moorer. (tot)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Morris Bart & Associates, LLC. (Jackson, J.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Morris Bart, LLC. (Jackson, J.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, filed by Morris Bart & Associates, LLC, Morris Bart, LLC. (Jackson, J.)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: 2 Order to file a disclosure statement. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to Show Cause why they failed to comply on or before 9/17/2019 as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED to attach a copy of blank disclosure statement form to this Order. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 09/10/2019. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: #1 Disclosure Statement) (srd).
September 9, 2019 Answer due from Alabama Pain and Injury Clinic, Inc. & James O. Gordon pursuant to FRCP 12(a) - See Docs. #4 & #5 . (tot)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, Alabama Pain and Injury Clinic, LLC Acknowledgement filed by Morris Bart & Associates, LLC, Morris Bart, LLC. (Jackson, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #1 Proof of Service) (tot).
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, James O. Gordon Acknowledgement filed by Morris Bart & Associates, LLC, Morris Bart, LLC. (Jackson, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #1 Proof of Service) (tot).
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alabama Pain and Injury Clinic, Inc., James O. Gordon. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Plaintiffs are each ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Wed. 9/4/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). For any Plaintiff that is a "professional association," its "[m]embers...need not be identified." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/28/2019. (ctn)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Pain and Injury Clinic, Inc., James O. Gordon ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2465994, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Morris Bart, LLC, Morris Bart & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - James O. Gordon, #2 Summons - Alabama Pain and Injury Clinic, LLC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jackson, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris Bart, LLC et al v. Gordon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Pain and Injury Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Bart, LLC
Represented By: Charles Brandon Browning
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Bart & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Charles Brandon Browning
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?