Kountz v. Futral et al
Plaintiff: Misty R. Kountz
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company and Kulton Daniel Futral
Case Number: 1:2019cv00601
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Remand Letter, Certified Docket Sheet and Order sent via email to Circuit Court of Mobile County re #5 Order on Motion to Remand. (mpp)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion to Remand and this action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/26/19. (mpp) Copies to counsel & Mobile Circuit Court
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Geico Indemnity Company. (Savarese, Steven)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement Doc. #2 filed by Geico Indemnity Company. (ktw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties) (Savarese, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Geico Indemnity Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number CV-2019-901071. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number BALSDC-2467101, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Savarese, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kountz v. Futral et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Steven Paul Savarese, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kulton Daniel Futral
Represented By: Patrick J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty R. Kountz
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Perloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?