Conquest Offshore BV et al v. M/V Pretty Team et al
Plaintiff: Conquest Offshore BV and Conquest Offshore Operations BV
Defendant: Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA, M/V Pretty Team, Ameropa AG, Core Industries, Inc. and International Materials, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00621
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Core Industries, Inc., International Materials, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
November 6, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV (Crutchfield, Blane)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER granting #37 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for the parties to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference. The parties are ORDERED to meet and file their Rule 26(f) report no later than 12/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/28/19. (lto)
October 28, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV re #36 Amended Complaint Notice of Filing of (Attachments: #1 Signed Verification to be filed with Document 36) (Crutchfield, Blane)
October 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by M/V Pretty Team, Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA. (Hails, Edward)
October 28, 2019 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ameropa AG, M/V Pretty Team, Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA, filed by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Crutchfield, Blane)
October 18, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Filing Defendant's Request for Production to Plaintiffs filed by M/V Pretty Team. (Hails, Edward)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #32 Defendants' Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record in light of the previous Order 33 granting the identical motion #31 . Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/13/19. (lto)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Defendants M/V Pretty Team, Pretty Team Shipping SA, and Parakou Shipping Ltd.'s Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record. Attorneys Allen E. Graham and E. Barrett Hails are added and Attorneys Charles G. De Leo and Ryon L. Little are terminated as counsel for these Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/13/19. (lto)
September 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #31 MOTION to Substitute Attorney , #32 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by M/V Pretty Team, Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA. (Hails, Edward)
September 12, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by M/V Pretty Team, Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA. (Graham, Allen)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 09/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Copy mailed to Attorney De Leo, Little, Tropnas, and Brock.) (nah)
September 10, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Blane H. Crutchfield on behalf of Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV (Crutchfield, Blane)
September 9, 2019 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00824. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendant Ameropa AG; GRANTING #26 Renewed Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue to United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama, Southern Division and Abatement of Case Management Report Deadline; DENYING AS MOOT #23 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue to United States District of Alabama, Southern Division. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Southern District of Alabama, Southern Division. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/5/2019. (AMP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to transfer case (renewed) by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brock, Lindsey) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV re 24 Order on motion to transfer case of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Ameropa AG (Brock, Lindsey) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER: #23 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. After Plaintiffs serve Defendant Ameropa AG, Plaintiffs shall supplement the #23 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue to state whether Defendant Ameropa AG consents to the transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama, Southern District. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/23/2019. (AMP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to transfer case to Southern District of Alabama, Southern Division by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brock, Lindsey) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #16 Amended Complaint in rem claim by Pretty Team Shipping SA.(Little, Ryon) Modified on 8/14/2019 to edit filer (PAM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #16 Amended Complaint Rule B Attachment - quasi in rem claim by Pretty Team Shipping SA.(Little, Ryon) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit text and link (PAM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #16 Amended Complaint in personam claim by Parakou Shipping, Ltd.(Little, Ryon) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit text (PAM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #16 Amended Complaint in personam claim by Pretty Team Shipping SA.(Little, Ryon) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit text (PAM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Brock, Lindsey) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by M/V Pretty Team Verified Statement of Right or Interest (De Leo, Charles) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE executed on 7/12/2019 as to M/V Pretty by Conquest Offshore. (AEJ) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 7/2/2019 by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV as to M/V Pretty Team. (AEJ) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Consent to Release of Vessel by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV re #8 Order (Brock, Lindsey) Modified text on 7/15/2019. (AEJ) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 PROCESS OF ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT ISSUED against M/V PRETTY TEAM, IMO # 9639763, Flag Marshall Islands, Gross Tonnage 23,232, Deadweight, 35,200 t, Length 179.88m. breadth extreme 29.8m, year built 2013; her engines, apparel, tackle, et al., located in the Port of Jacksonville, Florida and berthed at the Northside Generating Plant, along the St. Johns River. (AEJ) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to M/V Pretty Team, Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA. (AEJ) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 motion to appoint substitute custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/12/2019. (ASL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to issue arrest and attachment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/12/2019. (ASL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the issuance of the process of attachment and garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/12/2019. (ASL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 motion for the issuance of the warrant of arrest and/or summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/12/2019. (ASL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Verification by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Brock, Lindsey) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brock, Lindsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem , Emergency MOTION for issuance of Attachment by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Directing Issuance of Process of Attachment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Directing Issuance of Warrant, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Emergency Motion, #4 Exhibit Process of Attachment, #5 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Brock, Lindsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-824-J-39PDB. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V Pretty Team, Parakou Shipping, Ltd., Pretty Team Shipping SA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15679363) filed by Conquest Offshore BV, Conquest Offshore Operations BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Brock, Lindsey) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conquest Offshore BV et al v. M/V Pretty Team et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conquest Offshore BV
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Represented By: Lindsay C. Tropnas
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conquest Offshore Operations BV
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Represented By: Lindsay C. Tropnas
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parakou Shipping, Ltd.
Represented By: Ryon L. Little
Represented By: Charles G. De Leo
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pretty Team Shipping SA
Represented By: Ryon L. Little
Represented By: Charles G. De Leo
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Pretty Team
Represented By: Ryon L. Little
Represented By: Charles G. De Leo
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameropa AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Materials, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?