SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Welch et al
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Welch Law Firm, P.C. and Ruston C. Welch
Case Number: 1:2019cv00624
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Welch Law Firm, P.C., Ruston C. Welch. The plaintiff is to file its response by 11/18/2019. The defendants are to file any reply by 11/25/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 11/25/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/6/19. (mbp)
November 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support referred to Judge Steele. (mbp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Ruston C. Welch, Welch Law Firm, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Welch Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Stewart Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oklahoma Docket, #4 Exhibit 4 - Florida Docket, #5 Exhibit 5 - Florida Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Alabama Bankruptcy Docket, #7 Exhibit 7 - Oklahoma Bankruptcy Docket, #8 Exhibit 8 - SEPH v. Stewart Docket, #9 Exhibit 9 - SEPH v. Neverve Docket, #10 Exhibit 10 - SEPH v. ZLM Docket, #11 Exhibit 11 - ZLM Bankruptcy Docket, #12 Exhibit 12 - ZLM Bankruptcy Motion, #13 Exhibit 13 - ZLM Bankruptcy Motion, #14 Exhibit 14 - Limited Appearance, #15 Exhibit 15 - SEPH v. P&P Docket, #16 Exhibit 16 - Disclosure, #17 Exhibit 17 - Amended Disclosure, #18 Exhibit 18 - Supplemental Disclosure, #19 Exhibit 19 - Representation Agreement, #20 Exhibit 20 - Affiliate Representation Agreement, #21 Exhibit 21 - Fee Sharing Letter, #22 Exhibit 22 - Neverve Docket) (Hammond, Clark)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Ruston C. Welch on 11/4/2019; Welch Law Firm, P.C. on 11/4/2019.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/23/19. (cmj)
October 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to Judge Steele (cmj)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Ruston C. Welch, Welch Law Firm, P.C.. (Hammond, Clark)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order GRANTING #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Ruston C. Welch. Defendants are ORDERED to file and serve their response by 10/23/2019 as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 09/30/2019. (srd)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Ruston C. Welch, Welch Law Firm, P.C.. (Hammond, Clark)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Welch Law Firm, P.C. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019 (Reid, Samuel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Ruston C. Welch served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019 (Reid, Samuel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Welch Law Firm, P.C.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ruston C. Welch. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by SE Property Holdings, LLC to Welch Law Firm (Reid, Samuel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by SE Property Holdings, LLC to Ruston Welch (Reid, Samuel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruston C. Welch, Welch Law Firm, P.C. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2472693, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reid, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Welch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welch Law Firm, P.C.
Represented By: Clark R. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruston C. Welch
Represented By: Clark R. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Fraser Reid, III
Represented By: Richard M. Gaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?