Frasier et al v. Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melanie Frasier and Batman Express Train, LLC
Defendant: Frank Fowlkes and Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00631
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 REFERRAL OF #19 Brief to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
October 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court Referred to Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. (cmj)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 Brief filed by Batman Express Train, LLC, Melanie Frasier re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Batman Express Train, LLC, Melanie Frasier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Benton, Thomas)
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Benton, Thomas)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Batman Express Train, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/8/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #15 filed by Batman Express Train, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Batman Express Train, LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Batman Express Train, LLC is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Mon. 10/7/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/30/2019. (ctn)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #12 filed by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC, Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Blackboard Holdings, Inc., American International Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blackboard Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company for Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC.. (Jones, Allan)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/11/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/25/19. (cmj)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Melanie Frasier, Batman Express Train, LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Blackboard Insurance Company is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Fri. 9/27/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/20/2019. (ctn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Evidentiary Material Exhibit A to Answer to Complaint filed by Frank Fowlkes. (James, Paul)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Jones, Allan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC Amended and Restated from Mobile, case number 2019-902169. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2479615, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended and Restated Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Jones, Allan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant Frank Fowlkes' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Frank Fowlkes. (James, Paul)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. James, Jr on behalf of Frank Fowlkes (James, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Blackboard to file an amended Notice of Removal, as set out and to file a disclosure statement. Disclosure Statement Due 9/19/2019; Amended Notice of Removal deadline set for 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/12/19. (cmj)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Jones, Allan) Modified on 9/16/2019 (tgw).
September 12, 2019 Answer due from Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC and Frank Fowlkes pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (cmj)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC from Circuit Court of Mobile, AL, case number 19-902169. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2474190, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Jones, Allan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frasier et al v. Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Frasier
Represented By: Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Batman Express Train, LLC
Represented By: Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Fowlkes
Represented By: Allan Sidney Jones
Represented By: Paul M. James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC
Represented By: Allan Sidney Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?