Breland v. HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rebecca L. Breland
Defendant: HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00674
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #7 , #11 Disclosure Statements filed by HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/24/2019. (ctn)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc. (Steele, William)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc.. (Redmond, Wesley)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #7 Disclosure Statement filed by HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc. The statement satisfies the disclosure requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 but does not satisfy the broader disclosure requirements of S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc. Company is ORDERED to file an amended or supplemental disclosure statement that satisfies S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than Wed. 10/23/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/17/2019. (ctn)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/2/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/17/19. (cmj)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc. (Steele, William)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc.. (Redmond, Wesley)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc.. (Redmond, Wesley)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca L. Breland. HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc. served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Card) (Fuquay, Richard)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 9/19/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 11/1/2019.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/19/19. (cmj)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Rebecca L. Breland (Fuquay, Richard)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc. ( Receipt number AALSDC-2477828), filed by Rebecca L. Breland. (Fuquay, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breland v. HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca L. Breland
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: James A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeChoice of Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?