Deakle v. Climatemp Heating and Cooling, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Deakle
Defendant: Randy Englebert, Stan Englbert and Climatemp Heating and Cooling, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00678
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order, consolidating 19-cv-678 with the case, and closing 19-cv-678 statistically. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/7/2019. (mab)
October 29, 2019 REFERRAL OF #12 Response to Order to Show Cause to Judge Granade. (tot)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #10 Order to Show Cause filed by Climatemp Cooling & Heating, Inc., Randy Englebert, Stan Englebert. (Hannan, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 REFERRAL OF #11 Response to Order to Show Cause to Judge Granade. (tot)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #10 Order to Show Cause filed by Charlotte Deakle. (Brewster, Henry)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, the parties are to show cause, on or before 10/25/2019, why these two cases (19-425-CG-B & 19-678-CG-N) should not be consolidated for all purposes, including trial. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/11/19. (tot)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Deakle. Randy Englebert served on 10/10/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 (Brewster, Henry)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Deakle. Climatemp Cooling & Heating, Inc. served on 10/10/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 (Brewster, Henry)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading to the Complaint. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1) deadline for all Defendants to file and serve their answers is hereby extended to Fri. 11/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/11/2019. (ctn)
October 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (mab)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading to the Complaint, by Climatemp Cooling & Heating, Inc., Randy Englebert, Stan Englebert. (Hannan, Daniel) Modified on 10/11/2019 (mab). Modified on 10/11/2019 (mab).
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed : Stan Englebert by Charlotte Deakle. Stan Englebert served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019 (Brewster, Henry)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Service Notice issued 9/18/2019. Plaintiff's notice of service attempts due by 11/1/2019 pursuant to Civil L.R. 4(3). (mab)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Climatemp Heating and Cooling, Inc., Randy Englebert, and Stan Englebert. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Charlotte Deakle (Brewster, Henry)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Climatemp Heating and Cooling, Inc., Stan Englbert, Randy Englebert ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2477902, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Charlotte Deakle. (Brewster, Henry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deakle v. Climatemp Heating and Cooling, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Englebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Englbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Climatemp Heating and Cooling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Deakle
Represented By: L. Daniel Mims
Represented By: Henry H. Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?