Bettis et al v. Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Plaintiff: Kendrick J. Bettis and Mercedes L. French
Defendant: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00699
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Response to Order to Show Cause to Judge Steele. (mbp)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #9 Order to Show Cause, filed by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. RoundPoint is to show cause why this action should not be remanded to the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama for want of removal jurisdiction. Any other party wishing to be heard on the removal/remand may also file a memorandum of law by 11/8/19. (Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2019.). Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/29/19. (cmj)
October 22, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Suggestion of Bankruptcy to Judge Steele. (cmj)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele and Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (srr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Kendrick J. Bettis. (Patterson, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment, #2 consent) (srr)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing re: #2 MOTION to Sever and Realign the Parties filed by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation; Responses due by 10/4/2019; Replies due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/20/19. (srr)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Fri. 9/27/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/20/2019. (ctn)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/20/19. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Sever and Realign the Parties filed by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation from Circuit Court of Mobile County, case number CV-2019-901332. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2479495, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Ronderos, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bettis et al v. Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick J. Bettis
Represented By: James Donnie Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes L. French
Represented By: James Donnie Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?