Culley v. Marshall et al
Plaintiff: Halima Tariffa Culley
Defendant: Steve Marshall, City of Satsuma, Alabama and Ashley Rich
Case Number: 1:2019cv00701
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Response to Motion to Stay to Judge Moorer. (tot)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Joint MOTION to Stay of All Defendants filed by Halima Tariffa Culley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Clark, Brian)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order re: #9 Joint MOTION to Stay of All Defendants filed by Ashley Rich, Steve Marshall, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause by 11/15/2019, why this motion should not be granted. Any reply by Defendants is by 11/22/2019, after which the Court will take the motion under submission, as further set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/30/2019. (clr)
October 29, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Stay to Judge Moorer. (tot)
October 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Defendants' Joint MOTION to Stay Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Howell on behalf of Steve Marshall, Ashley Rich (Howell, Laura)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 Brief filed by Steve Marshall, Ashley Rich re #9 Joint MOTION to Stay of All Defendants filed by Steve Marshall, Ashley Rich. (Chynoweth, Brad)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay of All Defendants filed by Steve Marshall, Ashley Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sutton First Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit AG Marshall Motion to Dismiss Sutton Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit AG Marshall Brief in Support of Sutton Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Sutton's Opposition to AG Marshall's Motion, #5 Exhibit AG Marshall's Reply Brief in Sutton) (Chynoweth, Brad)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Watts, III on behalf of City of Satsuma, Alabama (Watts, William)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas O. Gaillard, III on behalf of City of Satsuma, Alabama (Gaillard, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Halima Tariffa Culley. Ashley Rich served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019 (Clark, Brian)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Halima Tariffa Culley. Steve Marshall served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019 (Clark, Brian)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to City of Satsuma, Alabama, Steve Marshall, Ashley Rich. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Halima Tariffa Culley (Clark, Brian)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 46031051542 (mab)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Satsuma, Alabama, Steve Marshall, Ashley Rich (Receipt number 46031051542, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by Halima Tariffa Culley. (Clark, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culley v. Marshall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Marshall
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: Brad Alan Chynoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Satsuma, Alabama
Represented By: William W. Watts, III
Represented By: Thomas O. Gaillard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Rich
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: Brad Alan Chynoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halima Tariffa Culley
Represented By: Brian Michael Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?