Johnson v. Mobile County, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Jakari Johnson
Defendant: The Personnel Board for Mobile County, Alabama and Mobile County, Alabama
Case Number: 1:2019cv00705
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Filing Interrogatories and Request for Production to Plaintiff filed by Mobile County, Alabama. (Hetrick, Scott)
November 6, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (nah)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Hetrick, Scott)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mobile County Personnel Board. (Madden, Arthur)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Mobile County Personnel Board. A review of the disclosure statement has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Mobile County Personnel Board. (Madden, Arthur)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur J. Madden, III on behalf of Mobile County Personnel Board (Madden, Arthur)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #7 . A review of the disclosure statement has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Mobile County, Alabama. (Hetrick, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mobile County, Alabama. (Hetrick, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jakari Johnson. Mobile County Personnel Board served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019 (Trueblood, Temple)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jakari Johnson. (Trueblood, Temple)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mobile County Personnel Board and Mobile County, Alabama. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Jakari Johnson. (Trueblood, Temple)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mobile County, Alabama, The Personnel Board for Mobile County, Alabama ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2482811, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jakari Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Trueblood, Temple) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Mobile County, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Personnel Board for Mobile County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jakari Johnson
Represented By: Temple DeAnna Trueblood
Represented By: Edward L. D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?