McMillian v. Mobile County Metro Jail
Petitioner: Derrick McMillian
Respondent: Mobile County Metro Jail and Warden Noah Price Oliver
Case Number: 1:2019cv00729
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of green card re: Habeas served 11/1/19 as to Warden Noah Price Oliver (cmj)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Alabama AG served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/30/2019. (cmj)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecil G. Brendle, Jr on behalf of Noah Price Oliver (Brendle, Cecil)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 46031051784 (cmj)
October 25, 2019 Service issued to Alabama Attorney General 70171000000013838016; Warden Noah Price Oliver 70171000000013838009. (cmj)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Clerk to Serve copy of 2254 petition and order on Respondent and Attorney General if fee paid. Respondent to answer within 30 days of service on AG as further set out. Filing Fee due by 11/4/2019. #2 Motion to Proceed Without Payment of Fees is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/04/2019. (srd) Copy to Petitioner.
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Derrick McMillian. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Derrick McMillian. (srd) Referred to Judge Nelson (PSU).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillian v. Mobile County Metro Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mobile County Metro Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Noah Price Oliver
Represented By: Cecil G. Brendle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick McMillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?