Griffin et al v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: W. Bry Shields, Carl Jackson, Michelle Haas, Caleb Ross, Earnest Hill and William Griffin
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00823
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Lexington Insurance Company on 12/20/2019. (jil)
November 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Lexington Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Lexington Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Monroe, Elliott)
November 1, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lexington Insurance Company. Lexington Insurance Company served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (See image at doc. 3) (cmj)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lexington Insurance Company on 10/29/2019, filed by William Griffin, Michelle Haas, Earnest Hill, Carl Jackson, Caleb Ross, W. Bry Shields. (Babington, Joseph)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lexington Insurance Company. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Lexington Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2493213, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Babington, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin et al v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Bry Shields
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Jackson
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Haas
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Ross
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest Hill
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Griffin
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Elliott Britton Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?