United States of America v. Heritage Compound Pharmacy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Heritage Compound Pharmacy, LLC, Marti P. Burgess and Christopher A. Burgess
Case Number: 1:2019cv00870
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P.73. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/4/19. (mbp)
November 22, 2019 REFERRAL OF #5 Notice of Settlement to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
November 22, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to Judge Beaverstock. (mpp)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Colson, Deidre)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Approve Consent Judgment by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Consent Judgment) (Colson, Deidre)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Christopher A. Burgess waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Marti P. Burgess waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Heritage Compound Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver) (jlr)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (mpp) Copy to Pltf.
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Brad Howard on 10/29/19 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 12/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Colson, Deidre)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-3) (Colson, Deidre) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Heritage Compound Pharmacy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Compound Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marti P. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deidre L. Colson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?