Traylor v. Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.
Plaintiff: Carlos Traylor
Defendant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00871
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp. by Carlos Traylor. Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp. served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/1/2020 (Martin, Richard)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/20/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Service Notice entered 10/31/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/31/19. (srr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Carlos Traylor (Martin, Richard)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Richard M. Martin, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2501798, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Carlos Traylor. (Martin, Richard)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2501747, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Carlos Traylor. (Martin, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traylor v. Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Traylor
Represented By: Richard M. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?