Wilson v. Stonkoski et al
Plaintiff: Daniel MacAuther Wilson
Defendant: Clark Stankoski, Tommy Lee Perdue and Daniel Hudson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00956
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order GRANTING Plaintiff an extension to file the motion to proceed without prepayment of fees, or pay the $400.00 filing fee by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/19/2019. (Copy of this order, order-doc. 3 and IFP form mailed to plaintiff as directed) (nah)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to re-file his Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or pay the $400.00 filing fee by 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/14/2019. (Copy of Order and IFP form mailed to Plaintiff) (nah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel MacAuther Wilson - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (nah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Daniel Hudson, Tommy Lee Perdue, Clark Stankoski, filed by Daniel MacAuther Wilson - Ref to MJ/Nelson (PSU). (nah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Stonkoski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Stankoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Lee Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel MacAuther Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?