Mainous et al v. U.S. Lawns, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raeanne E. Mainous, SRM Landscape Maintenance, LLC, Steven L. Mainous and Grassmasters Landscape Management, LLC
Defendant: U.S. Lawns, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00962
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #18 Reply to Response to Motion to Transfer, #16 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge Moorer. (tot)
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion #9 (Exhibits filed as Doc 16-1 through 16-4) filed by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Reid, Samuel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim by Grassmasters Landscape Management, LLC, SRM Landscape Maintenance, LLC. (Holifield, Jennifer) Modified on 12/12/2019 (tot).
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to its Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by U.S. Lawns, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Mainous FDD Excerpt, #2 Current FDD, #3 Declaration of Ken Hutcheson, #4 Notice of Appeal) (Reid, Samuel)
December 6, 2019 REFERRAL OF #15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #14 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Moorer. (tot)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Reid, Samuel)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by U.S. Lawns, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ch. 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period, #2 Summary of Assets and Liabilities, #3 Excerpt from Instructions for Bankruptcy Forms for Individuals, Dec. 2015 (Rev. Oct. 2019)) (Reid, Samuel)
December 5, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer to Judge Moorer. (tot)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Change Venue (Exhibits filed as Docs. 3 and 8) filed by Grassmasters Landscape Management, LLC, Raeanne E. Mainous, Steven L. Mainous, SRM Landscape Maintenance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Holifield, Jennifer)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants U.S. Lawns, Inc., BrightView Landscapes, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BrightView Landscapes, LLC for U.S. Lawns, Inc... (Reid, Samuel)
November 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holifield, Jennifer)
November 22, 2019 Answer to #10 Counterclaim due from Grassmasters Landscape Management, LLC, SRM Landscape Maintenance, LLC pursuant to FRCP 12(a)(1)(B). (tot)
November 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #9 MOTION to Transfer Venue, #3 Notice of Filing Exhibits, #8 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge Moorer. (tot)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Grassmasters Landscape Management, LLC, SRM Landscape Maintenance, LLC by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Franchise Agreement), #2 Exhibit B (Assignment and Assumption Agreement)) (Reid, Samuel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue (Exhibits filed as Docs. 3 and 8) filed by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Reid, Samuel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by U.S. Lawns, Inc. re: #3 Notice of Filing Exhibits,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Case, Oct. 9, 2019 Hrg Tr.) (Reid, Samuel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Steven L. Mainous. (Holifield, Jennifer)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Raeanne E. Mainous. (Holifield, Jennifer)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Grassmasters Landscape Management, LLC. (Holifield, Jennifer)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff SRM Landscape Maintenance, LLC. (Holifield, Jennifer)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by U.S. Lawns, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Franchise Agreement), #2 Exhibit B (Assignment and Assumption Agreement), #3 Exhibit C (Chapter 13 Plan), #4 Exhibit D (Bankruptcy Case - Claims 9 and 10), #5 Exhibit E (Bankruptcy Case - Dkt. 50), #6 Exhibit F (Bankrupty Case - Dkt. 85), #7 Exhibit G (Bankruptcy Case - Oct. 9 Hearing), #8 Exhibit H (Business Entity Records _ AL Secretary of State), #9 Exhibit I (Bankruptcy Case - Oct. 22 Hearing)) (Reid, Samuel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Plaintiffs Grassmasters Landscape Management, LLC, SRM Landscape Maintenance, LLC & Defendant U.S. Lawns, Inc.; Disclosure Statements Due 11/26/2019. Please list members of LLC. (tot)
November 13, 2019 Answer due from U.S. Lawns, Inc., pursuant to FRCP 81(c)(2). (tot)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2510659, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reid, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mainous et al v. U.S. Lawns, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raeanne E. Mainous
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRM Landscape Maintenance, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L. Mainous
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grassmasters Landscape Management, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Lawns, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Fraser Reid, III
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?