Harrell v. Dennis
Plaintiff: Reginald Harrell
Defendant: Davis Dennis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00963
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Reginald Harrell. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray/PSU. (cmj)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 1983 COMPLAINT against Davis Dennis, filed by Reginald Harrell; ref to Judge Murray/PSU. (cmj)
December 19, 2019 NEF, doc. 5, 1983 complaint and IFP mailed to Plaintiff (cmj)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court has considered Plaintiff's filing dated December 17, 2019 (Doc. 4) as a request for an extension of time to file his 1983 complaint and his motion to proceed without prepayment of fees on this Court's forms. Accordingly, Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension of time to refile his complaint and his motion to proceed without prepayment of fees to February 3, 2020. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a copy of this Court's form for a complaint under 1983 and a copy of this Court's form for a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees. Plaintiff is instructed to completely fill out both of these forms with all requested information and to return both forms to the Court prior to February 3, 2020. If Plaintiff does not complete and return both of these forms by that date, his complaint may be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/18/19. (lto)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Court stating he would like to keep his case open; ref to Judge Murray (cmj)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for plaintiff to file complete 1983 complaint and correct IFP form by 12/6/19. The Motion IFP (doc. 2) is denied as procedurally deficient. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 12/6/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/14/19. (order, complaint (doc. 1), 1983 form and IFP form mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Reginald Harrell. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (cmj)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Davis Dennis, filed by Reginald Harrell; ref to Judge Murray (PSU). (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell v. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?