Mobile County Board of Health et al v. Sackler et al
Plaintiff: Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic and Mobile County Board of Health
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Beverly Sackler, Allergan Sales, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Mark Timney, Specgx, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Kathe Sackler, Allergan Finance, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Sunrise Lee, Xiulu Ruan, Alec Burlakoff, Wal-Mart Inc., John Kapoor, Allergan PLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Richard Sackler, Michael J. Gurry, H.D. Smith, LLC, Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., MD John Patrick Couch, Actavis LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Vanessa Weatherspoon, Thomas Justin Palmer, Cardinal Health, Inc., Michael L. Babich, Mitchell "Chip&quot Fisher, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Joe Read, Craig Landau, Cephalon, Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Jonathan Sackler, CVS Health Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Chris Hargrave, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lyndsie Fowler, John Stewart, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Russell Gasdia, Richard M. Simon, Brandon Hasenfuss, Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Bridgette Parker, Rebecca Sterling, The Kroger Co., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Henry Schein, Inc., Joe Coggins, Noramco, Inc., Joseph A. Rowan, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., David Sackler, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Allergan USA, Inc., Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C., Mallinckrodt LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. and Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01007
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order DENYING #7 MOTION to Stay, #23 MOTION to Stay and DENYING relief requested in #20 Notice filed by the Sackler Defendants. The #3 MOTION to Remand is GRANTED. This action is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, from whence it came. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 01/15/2020. (nah)
January 8, 2020 REFERRAL OF #31 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge DuBose. (nah)
January 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Remand , REFERRAL OF #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, and #26 Response in Support of Motion, to Judge DuBose. (nah)
January 8, 2020 Filing 32 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #2 filed by McKesson Corporation; Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc.; Disclosure Statement #8 filed by Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health. A review of the disclosure statements has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay , #23 MOTION to Stay (MOVING DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING LIKELY TRANSFER TO MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION [Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Moving Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Motion to Stay] filed by Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Walker, George)
January 7, 2020 REFERRAL OF #30 Response to Court's Order to Judge DuBose. (nah)
January 6, 2020 Filing 30 Response to Court's Order filed by McKesson Corporation re #22 Order,, Set Deadlines, #20 Notice (Other), . (Prater, Harlan) Modified on 1/7/2020 (nah).
January 6, 2020 REFERRAL OF #29 Response to Order to Judge DuBose. (nah)
January 6, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #22 Order,, Set Deadlines, by Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health filed by Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health. (Walker, George)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER. NOTED: Doc. #27 Plaintiffs' Motion for Oral Argument. A hearing will be scheduled if the undersigned determines that it would be helpful. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/03/20. (ktw)
January 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #27 MOTION for Oral Argument re #3 MOTION to Remand Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (nah)
January 2, 2020 REFERRAL OF #26 Response in Support of Motion to Remand to Judge Bivins. (nah)
January 2, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Oral Argument re #3 MOTION to Remand filed by Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health. (Walker, George)
January 2, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand [Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand] filed by Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health. (Walker, George)
January 2, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc... (Irvine, George)
December 30, 2019 REFERRAL OF #24 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Bivins. (nah)
December 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #23 MOTION to Stay (MOVING DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING LIKELY TRANSFER TO MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION to Judge DuBose (nah)
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand (DEFENDANT McKESSON CORPORATION'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5-1, #6 Exhibit Ex 5-2, #7 Exhibit Ex 5-3, #8 Exhibit Ex 5-4, #9 Exhibit Ex 5-5, #10 Exhibit Ex 5-6, #11 Exhibit Ex 6, #12 Exhibit Ex 7) (Prater, Harlan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay (MOVING DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING LIKELY TRANSFER TO MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Exhibit Ex 6, #7 Exhibit Ex 7, #8 Exhibit Ex 8, #9 Exhibit Ex 9, #10 Exhibit Ex 10, #11 Exhibit Ex 11, #12 Exhibit Ex 12, #13 Exhibit Ex 13, #14 Exhibit Ex 14, #15 Exhibit Ex 15, #16 Exhibit Ex 16, #17 Exhibit Ex 17, #18 Exhibit Ex 18, #19 Exhibit Ex 19, #20 Exhibit Ex 20, #21 Exhibit Ex 21, #22 Exhibit Ex 22) (Prater, Harlan)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order for parties to file a brief responding to #20 Notice filed by Theresa Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Richard Sackler, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, David Sackler as well as its impact on the motion to remand. Brief due by 1/6/2020.. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/23/19. (cmj)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond as follows: all properly served defendants shall have until 10 days after the Court's order on the motion to remand, to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/20/2019. (SHG)
December 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF #20 Notice of Fourth Amended Bankruptcy Court Order Enjoining the Continuation of this Proceeding as to the Individual Former Directors, to Judge DuBose. (nah)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler of Fourth Amended Bankruptcy Court Order Enjoining the Continuation of this Proceeding as to the Individual Former Directors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Chason, Allan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan R. Chason on behalf of Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Chason, Allan)
December 16, 2019 REFERRAL OF #18 Response to Motion, to Judge DuBose. (nah)
December 16, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Stay [Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply to Manufacturing Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for a Temporary Stay (Doc. 15)] filed by Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health. (Walker, George)
December 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/14/19. (gcp)
December 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Manufacturer Defendants' Motion for a Temporary Stay to Judge DuBose (nah)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Manufacturer Defendants' Motion for a Temporary Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Sur-Reply to Manufacturing Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion for a Temporary Stay]) (Walker, George)
December 11, 2019 REFERRAL OF #15 Reply in Support of MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation to Judge DuBose. (nah)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to #7 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Walker, Caroline)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #3 MOTION to Remand filed by Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health; Responses due by 12/27/2019; Replies due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/6/19. (srr)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Van Haneghan on behalf of Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health (Van Haneghan, Emily)
December 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Remand - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (nah)
December 5, 2019 REFERRAL OF #3 MOTION to Remand; #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and #7 MOTION to Stay and #11 Memorandum in Opposition to motion to stay to Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. (mab)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Case re-assigned to Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
December 5, 2019 REFERRAL OF #11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Stay to Judge Granade. (tot)
December 4, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED:, #3 MOTION to Remand; #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and #7 MOTION to Stay pending likely transfer to MDL; Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay filed by Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health. (Walker, George)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Hand Arendall re: conflict (cmj)
December 3, 2019 Case reassigned to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (cmj)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hansel Eli Lightner, II on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Lightner, Hansel)
November 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Stay to Judge Beaverstock (nah)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic, Mobile County Board of Health. (Walker, George)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Walker, Caroline)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Walker on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Walker, Thomas)
November 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to Judge Beaverstock (nah)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Caroline)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance as Counsel on behalf of Defendants Jannssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Caroline) Modified on 11/26/2019 (srd).
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Walker, George)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Prater, Harlan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2516173, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Prater, Harlan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile County Board of Health et al v. Sackler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Donna Welch
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Timney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Miller Benoit
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Brandon Keith Essig
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Doss
Represented By: Jackson R. Sharman, III
Represented By: Benjamin P. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D. A. Sackler
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiulu Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alec Burlakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Arlington
Represented By: Scott D. Powers
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Gurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Represented By: David L. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD John Patrick Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Cason Michael Kirby
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Weatherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Justin Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Johnson deGruy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell "Chip&quot Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co., Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Cason Michael Kirby
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hargrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndsie Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Represented By: David L. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Gasdia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Hasenfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgette Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Betsy Richardson
Represented By: Sela Stroud Blanton
Represented By: Betsy Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Cason Michael Kirby
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Represented By: John A. Henig, Jr.
Represented By: Brandon J. Montminy
Represented By: C. Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Coggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny A. Hergenrother
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Represented By: Cari K. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Betsy Richardson
Represented By: Sela Stroud Blanton
Represented By: Betsy Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Donna Welch
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Miller Benoit
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Oriented Primary Health Care Clinic
Represented By: Rebecca D. Parks
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: George M. Walker
Represented By: Emily Van Haneghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile County Board of Health
Represented By: Rebecca D. Parks
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: George M. Walker
Represented By: Emily Van Haneghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?