Scott v. ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Scott
Defendant: Mark Bass and ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv01038
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association, Mark Bass. Responses due by 2/12/2020; Replies due by 2/19/2020. Motion to be taken under submission on 2/19/2020.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/30/20. (cmj)
January 30, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law Judge Steele (cmj)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Bass, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Bass Dec., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Bass Dec., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Bass Dec., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Bass Dec., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Bass Dec.) (Goodman, Laurence)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss due to filing of amended complaint. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/27/20. (cmj)
January 27, 2020 REFERRAL OF #16 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
January 24, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion #7 to Dismiss filed by Mark Bass, ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association. (Goodman, Laurence)
January 21, 2020 REFERRAL OF #15 Response to Judge Steele. (cmj)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Derrick Scott. (Rainey, L.)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Bass, ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association, filed by Derrick Scott. (Rainey, L.)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association, Mark Bass. Responses due by 1/17/2020; Replies due by 1/24/2020; Motion to be taken under submission on 1/24/2020. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/3/20. (cmj)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by Mark Bass, Corporate Disclosure Statement #9 filed by ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association (Cassady, William)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by Mark Bass; Corporate Disclosure Statement #9 filed by ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association. (Steele, William)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Mark Bass. (Goodman, Laurence)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association. (Goodman, Laurence)
December 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Laurence M. Goodman, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/28/19. (Cassady, William)
December 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law to Judge Steele (cmj)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Bass, #2 Exhibit 1 to Bass Dec., #3 Exhibit 2 to Bass Dec., #4 Exhibit 3 to Bass Dec., #5 Exhibit 4 to Bass Dec., #6 Exhibit 5 to Bass Dec.) (Goodman, Laurence)
December 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Laurence M. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (cmj)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Laurence M. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2537525, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goodman, Laurence)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Proof of Service by Derrick Scott. Mark Bass served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019 (Rainey, L.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 12/6/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 1/17/2020.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/6/19. (cmj)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark Bass, ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Derrick Scott of filing proposed summons (Rainey, L.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2522072, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rainey, L.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bass
Represented By: Laurence M. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILA Local 140 International Longshoremen's Association
Represented By: Laurence M. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Scott
Represented By: L. Bratton Rainey, III
Represented By: Brigg Hails Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?