LaForce v. Owens
Appellee: Terrie S. Owens
Appellant: Candace LaForce
Case Number: 1:2019cv01086
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome E. Speegle on behalf of Terrie S. Owens (Speegle, Jerome)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. (nah)
January 8, 2020 REFERRAL OF #2 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal to Judge DuBose. (nah)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal transmitted by Bankruptcy Court re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Notice. Bankruptcy No. 15-1883 (Nixon, Velda)
December 16, 2019 REFERRAL OF #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Notice to Judge DuBose. (nah)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court filed by Appellant Candace LaForce transmitted to District Court. Transmittal letter, notice of appeal, order appealed, and Bankruptcy docket sheet included. (Nixon, Velda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaForce v. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Terrie S. Owens
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Candace LaForce
Represented By: Jodi D. Dubose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?