Peebles et al v. The Terminix International Company, L. P.
Plaintiff: John Peebles and Allison Peebles
Defendant: The Terminix International Company, L. P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01089
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 REFERRAL OF #20 Reply, to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
February 7, 2020 Filing 21 Case re-assigned to District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. District Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
February 7, 2020 REFERRAL OF #20 Reply to #12 Supplement to #1 Motion to Confirm and Response in Opposition to Terminix's #4 Motions to Vacate, #10 MOTION for Sanctions and Response to Omnibus #4 Motion to Vacate, to Judge Moorer. (mab)
February 7, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to #12 Supplement to #1 Motion to Confirm and Response in Opposition to Terminix's #4 Motions to Vacate, #10 MOTION for Sanctions and Response to Omnibus #4 Motion to Vacate filed by The Terminix International Company, L. P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (King, M.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2020: #2 Main Document) (cmj).
January 30, 2020 REFERRAL OF #19 Amended Stipulation Identifying the Citizenship of Terminex International Co., LP's Partners to Judge Moorer. (tot)
January 30, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION (Amended Joint Stipulation, Identifying the Citizenship of Terminix International Co., LP's Partners by The Terminix International Company, L. P.. (King, M.)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order re: #16 Parties' JOINT Stipulation, Identifying the Citizenship of Terminix International Co., LP's Partners. Parties are ORDERED to file an amended joint stipulation identifying citizenship of relevant parties no later than 2/7/2020 as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 01/29/2020. (srd)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: To the extent Defendant wishes to file a response to the Motion for Sanctions (Doc. #10 ), any response shall be due on or before February 7, 2020. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/28/2020. (mab)
January 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #16 Parties' JOINT Stipulation, Identifying the Citizenship of Terminix International Co., LP's Partners, filed in compliance with #11 Order, to Judge Nelson. (mab)
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 Parties' JOINT Stipulation, Identifying the Citizenship of Terminix International Co., LP's Partners, filed by The Terminix International Company, L. P.. (King, M.) Modified on 1/14/2020 (mab).
January 7, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 Motion for Sanctions Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 7, 2020 REFERRAL OF #4 Motion to Vacate, Modify, or Correct the Arbitrator's Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses, #5 Brief in Support; #8 Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibit; and responses in opposition (Docs. #10 , #12 ) Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 7, 2020 REFERRAL OF #1 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; #6 Objection; and #12 Supplement to #1 Motion to Confirm to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant The Terminix International Company, L. P.. (King, M.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Taylor Matthews on behalf of The Terminix International Company, L. P. (Matthews, Logan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Terry F. Moorer and Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (srr)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 Supplement to #1 Motion to Confirm Award, and Response in Opposition to Terminix's #4 Motions to Vacate, filed by Allison Peebles, John Peebles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Arbitration Award) (Campbell, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order that the parties are to file and serve a joint stipulation by 1/10/2020 that identifies Terminix's partners and properly alleges their citizenship for purposes of 1332(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/3/20. (srr)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Sanctions and Response to Omnibus #4 Motion to Vacate, filed by Allison Peebles, John Peebles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Campbell, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Terminix International Company, L. P. is ORDERED to file a Disclosure Statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Mon. 1/6/2020 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/30/2019. (ctn)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Remark: Consent form removed since it was only signed by one party. There is no document 7. (mab)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibit in support of #4 Motion to Vacate, Modify, or Correct the Arbitrator's Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses, filed by The Terminix International Company, L. P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (King, M.)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Objection re: #1 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Opposition to Claimants' Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) filed by The Terminix International Company, L. P.. (King, M.)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Brief filed by The Terminix International Company, L. P. filed by The Terminix International Company, L. P.. (King, M.) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/27/2019) (skb).
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate , Modify, or Correct the Arbitrator's Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses filed by The Terminix International Company, L. P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (King, M.)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment, #2 consent) (srr)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order re: #1 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Allison Peebles, John Peebles, Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019, Replies due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/13/19. (srr)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Allison Peebles, John Peebles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, #2 Exhibit Exh 2, #3 Exhibit Exh 3) (Campbell, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (srr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peebles et al v. The Terminix International Company, L. P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Peebles
Represented By: Thomas F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Peebles
Represented By: Thomas F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Terminix International Company, L. P.
Represented By: M. Christian King
Represented By: Logan Taylor Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?