Young v. Bush et al
Plaintiff: Jason Todd Young
Defendant: Barbara Bush, Johny Young, Beth Young, Jed Bush, Jenna Bush and George Bush, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01102
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/17/2020. (bld)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason Todd Young. (Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins(PSU) on 1/17/2020). (tot)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barbara Bush, Jed Bush, Jenna Bush filed by Jason Todd Young. (Referred to MJ/Bivins(PSU) on 1/17/2020) (tot)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/9/2020. (mpp)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Information re: Case by Jason Todd Young (Referred to MJ/Bivins(PSU) on 1/17/2020) (tot)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order, Plf is directed file another motion to proceed without prepayment of fees, & he is directed to complete the entire form & file it NLT 1/27/2020. Plf must file an amended complaint as set out NLT 1/31/2020. The Clerk is directed to retain the 300 to 400 pages submitted by Plf on 1/6/2020 in a separate file folder. The Clerk is directed to send Plf the Court's form for a motion to proceed without prepayments of fees & a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/7/2020. (copy mailed to Plf w/form & Pro Se Litigant Guide on 1/7/2020) (tot)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Information re: case by Jason Todd Young; referred to MJ/Bivins(PSU) (mab)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Information re case by Jason Todd Young; referred to MJ/Bivins(PSU) (mab)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-B after the case number on all future pleadings. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (clr)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration & disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/20/19. (copy mailed to Plf on 12/20/19) (tot)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Information re: Case by Jason Todd Young. (Referred to MJ/Milling on 12/20/19) (tot)
December 20, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (clr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Information re: Case by Jason Todd Young. (Referred to MJ/Milling on 12/20/19) (tot)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason Todd Young. (Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 12/20/19) (tot)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barbara Bush, George Bush, Jr., Jed Bush, Jenna Bush, Beth Young, Johny Young filed by Jason Todd Young. (Referred to MJ/Milling on 12/20/19) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Bush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Todd Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johny Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenna Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bush, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?