Bass et al v. M/V Star Isfjord et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Bass and Jocelyn Bass
Defendant: M/V Star Isfjord, G2 Ocean and Greig Star Shipping
Case Number: 1:2020cv00007
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Jocelyn Bass, Patrick Bass re #3 Service Order, #7 Waiver of Service Executed (Mackey, Peter)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick Bass. G2 Ocean waiver sent on 2/6/2020, answer due 5/6/2020; Greig Star Shipping waiver sent on 2/6/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. (Mackey, Peter)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Thomas W. Shlosman to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #5 Motion for Patrick H. Hufft to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/14/2020. (clr)
January 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION and APPLICATION for Thomas W. Shlosman to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #5 MOTION and APPLICATION for Patrick H. Hufft to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (nah)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION and APPLICATION for Patrick H. Hufft to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2548460, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hufft, Patrick)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION and APPLICATION for Thomas W. Shlosman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2548447, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Shlosman, Tom)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 1/7/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 2/20/2020.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 1/7/20. (cmj)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to G2 Ocean, Greig Star Shipping, M/V Star Isfjord. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2543465, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Patrick Bass, Jocelyn Bass. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Summons - M/V Star Isfjord, #3 Appendix Summons - Greig Star Shipping, #4 Appendix Summons - G2 Ocean) (Mackey, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass et al v. M/V Star Isfjord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bass
Represented By: Peter S. Mackey
Represented By: Tom Shlosman
Represented By: Patrick H. Hufft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Bass
Represented By: Peter S. Mackey
Represented By: Tom Shlosman
Represented By: Patrick H. Hufft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Star Isfjord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G2 Ocean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greig Star Shipping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?