James v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Teryll Demetrius James
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00038
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Howard L. Nations. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 1:19-cv-00169. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2556031, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Nations, Howard)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. (skb)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12733. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/23/2020. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/23/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/23/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/23/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/23/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/23/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7867576) filed by Teryll Demetrius James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Teryll Demetrius James(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teryll Demetrius James
Represented By: Albertus F. Wiesedeppe
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?