Atwood v. Mobile County Metro Jail et al
Plaintiff: Sean Gaston Atwood
Defendant: Captain Stallworth, Seaton Fitzgerald, Noah Price "Tre Oliver, Mobile County Metro Jail, Sam Cochran and Noah Price (Trey) Oliver, III
Case Number: 1:2020cv00048
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order GRANTING Warden Noah Price Oliver an extension to comply with #3 Order until 3/20/2020. Clerk is DIRECTED to send copies as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 02/20/2020. (srd) Copies to parties.
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Warden Noah Price re #3 Order. Referred to MJ/Nelson (PSU). (skb)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order, directing Warden Noah Price of Mobile County Jail to provide the Court with a completed certificate and a copy of Plaintiff's inmate account as set out in Order by 3/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/31/2020. (copy to Pltf and Warden Price with copy of certificate) (mab)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sean Gaston Atwood. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (skb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Sam Cochran, Seaton Fitzgerald, Mobile County Metro Jail, Noah Price (Trey) Oliver, III, and Captain Stallworth filed by Sean Gaston Atwood.Referred to MJ/Nelson (PSU). (skb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atwood v. Mobile County Metro Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaton Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Price "Tre Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County Metro Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Price (Trey) Oliver, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Gaston Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?