Bayside Property Consultants LLC et al v. City Of Mobile et al
Plaintiff: Bayside Property Consultants LLC and Steve Mears
Defendant: Joe Reagan, Exit Realty, Mobile City Council, Toulminville, LLC, J. Roe Burton, Mobile City Planning Commission, Surety Land Title, Inc., Don Williams, Helen Emmons, Hall-Baumhauer/Baskerville-Donovan, Inc., Williams Engineering and Construction Co., Inc., U. S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, Crane Title, Inc., City Of Mobile and Philip Burton
Case Number: 1:2020cv00063
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order extending deadline for parties' Rule 26(f) report. ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/15/2020.) Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/19/20. (cmj)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from U. S. Department of Housing and Urban Development on 5/5/2020.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/5/20. (cmj)
March 4, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Referred to Judge Steele. (cmj)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Answer due deadline, filed by U. S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Heisterhagen, Kasee)
February 26, 2020 REFERRAL OF #6 Notice of Filing to Judge Steele. (cmj)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by U. S. Department of Housing and Urban Development re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Answer due deadline, of Filing of State Court Transcript (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certification of Record, #2 Transcript of Case No. 02-CV-902497, #3 Excerpt of the AlaCourt docket sheet) (Heisterhagen, Kasee)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 WRIT of Certiorari issued as to Clerk of the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama. (cmj)
February 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Writ of Certiorari under 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) to Judge Steele (cmj)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Writ of Certiorari under 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) filed by U. S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Heisterhagen, Kasee)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Government to supplement its Notice of Removal with a complete copy of the state court record by 2/26/20. The Federal Defendants are to file an answer or responsive pleading no later than 3/6/20. ( Supplement deadline set for 2/26/2020; Answer due from Federal Defendants no later than 3/6/2020). Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/11/20. (cmj)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/23/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/6/20. (cmj)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL , filed by U. S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing in State Court of Removal, #3 State Court Docket Sheet as of 02 05 2020, #4 State Court Documents Relevant to HUD removal) (Heisterhagen, Kasee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayside Property Consultants LLC et al v. City Of Mobile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Reagan
Represented By: George C. Gaston, I
Represented By: R. Scott Traweek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exit Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile City Council
Represented By: Wanda J. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toulminville, LLC
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Liles
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Roe Burton
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Liles
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile City Planning Commission
Represented By: Christine Burns Segarra
Represented By: Douglas L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surety Land Title, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Burns Segarra
Represented By: Douglas L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Williams
Represented By: John L. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Emmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall-Baumhauer/Baskerville-Donovan, Inc.
Represented By: George C. Gaston, I
Represented By: R. Scott Traweek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Engineering and Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: John L. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Title, Inc.
Represented By: William Craig Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Mobile
Represented By: Christine Burns Segarra
Represented By: Douglas L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Burton
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Liles
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayside Property Consultants LLC
Represented By: Marion E. Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Mears
Represented By: Marion E. Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?