People's United Bank v. Teumer et al
Plaintiff: People's United Bank
Defendant: Lee Teumer and Victor Teumer
Case Number: 1:2020cv00087
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by People's United Bank. Lee Teumer served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020 (Parrott, Evan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by People's United Bank (Milling, Bert)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff People's United Bank. (Parrott, Evan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 Blank Disclosure Statement form e-mailed to Plaintiff People's United Bank; Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement Due 2/21/2020 pursuant to Civil L.R. 7.1. (mab)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Lee Teumer & Victor Teumer. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by People's United Bank to Victor Teumer and Lee Teumer (Parrott, Evan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Teumer, Victor Teumer ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2571130, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by People's United Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Parrott, Evan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2020: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People's United Bank v. Teumer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People's United Bank
Represented By: Evan Parrott
Represented By: Thomas S. Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Teumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Teumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?