Jardine v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: James Q Jardine
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00091
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order setting telephonic scheduling conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2020 10:30 AM with Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. See call in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/14/20. (cmj)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
April 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #17 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (cmj)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Comer, Bryan)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers due from Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company on 4/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 04/06/2020. (jil)
April 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, filed by James Q Jardine. (Comer, Bryan)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file his Amended Complaint not later than 3/24/20. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 4) is hereby mooted. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 03/17/2020. (jil)
March 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Q Jardine. (Comer, Bryan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by James Q Jardine. (Comer, Bryan)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Desmond V. Tobias on behalf of James Q Jardine (Tobias, Desmond)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/12/2020; Replies due by 3/19/2020; Motion to be taken under submission on 3/20/2020.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/27/20. (cmj)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #3 , #2 Corporate Disclosure Statements filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and by the Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 02/26/2020. (Anthony, Porcha)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/26/20. (cmj)
February 26, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy) (Wahlheim, William)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Lincoln National Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.. (Wahlheim, William)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Met Life, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Met Life, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Wahlheim, William)
February 19, 2020 Answer due from Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (cmj)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2572631, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - August 2018 Financial Report, #4 Exhibit D - Policy Info Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wahlheim, William) (Attachment 5 replaced on 2/19/2020) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jardine v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Q Jardine
Represented By: Bryan Eugene Comer
Represented By: Desmond V. Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?