SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Stefan et al
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Chester J. Stefan and The Michael Patrick Barbour, Sr. 2007 Irrevocable Trust
Case Number: 1:2020cv00099
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Chester J. Stefan, The Michael Patrick Barbour, Sr. 2007 Irrevocable Trust Responses due by 5/4/2020; Replies due by 5/18/2020; Motion to be taken under submission on 5/19/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 4/6/20. (cmj)
April 6, 2020 REFERRAL OF #12 Offer of Judgment to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
April 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6); ref to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
April 4, 2020 Filing 12 OFFER OF JUDGMENT () filed by The Michael Patrick Barbour, Sr. 2007 Irrevocable Trust, Chester J. Stefan. (McKerall, Samuel)
April 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (McKerall, Samuel)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers due from Chester J. Stefan and The Michael Patrick Barbour, Sr. 2007 Irrevocable Trust on 4/3/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 03/20/2020. (jil)
March 20, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (McKerall, Samuel)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel G. McKerall on behalf of All Defendants (McKerall, Samuel)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed on all Defendants by SE Property Holdings, LLC. All Defendants (Newman, J.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Chester J. Stefan, The Michael Patrick Barbour, Sr. 2007 Irrevocable Trust. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by SE Property Holdings, LLC Summons to Stefan and to Barbour Trust (Attachments: #1 Summons to Trust) (Newman, J.)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 2/26/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 4/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/26/20. (mpp) Copy to Pltf.
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment Form) (mpp) Copy to Pltf
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chester J. Stefan, The Michael Patrick Barbour, Sr. 2007 Irrevocable Trust ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2574549, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Deed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Newman, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Stefan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester J. Stefan
Represented By: Samuel G. McKerall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Michael Patrick Barbour, Sr. 2007 Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Samuel G. McKerall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?