Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk v. CAC Maritime
Plaintiff: Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk
Defendant: CAC Maritime
Not Classified By Court: Stiegler Shipping Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00102
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 3/13/2010 as to CAC Maritime (meh)
March 30, 2020 REFERRAL OF #19 Response to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
March 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Cox on behalf of Stiegler Shipping Company, Inc. (Cox, John)
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment, #8 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment filed by Stiegler Shipping Company, Inc.. (Cox, John)
March 9, 2020 Filing 18 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Amended Disclosure Statement #16 filed by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #13 Disclosure Statement and #16 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/6/2020. (ctn)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. Amendment to #13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Clarke, Timothy)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #13 Disclosure Statement filed by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. The disclosure statement tracks only the language of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. This is insufficient because the disclosure requirements of S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 are broader than those of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. See S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b) ("The Disclosure Statement shall identify the represented entity's general nature and shall identify all parents, subsidiaries, partners, members, managers, trustees, affiliates, and similarly related persons and entities."); Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk is ORDERED to file an amended disclosure statement that complies with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than Wed. 3/11/2020 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/4/2020. (ctn)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #13 filed by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. (Clarke, Timothy)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Service Order entered 2/26/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 3/6/2020.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/25/20. (cmj)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 USMS Confirmation of Delivery of #9 Writ Issued, #8 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment. Document delivered 2/26/20. (cmj)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (required of "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (required of "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Wed. 3/4/2020 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/26/2020. (ctn)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 WRIT of Attachment issued (cmj)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Writ. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/23/20. (cmj)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CAC Maritime. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
February 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Order and Warrant Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment, #4 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment, #6 MOTION for Writ of Attachment Writ of Attachment to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Writ of Attachment Writ of Attachment by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. (Betbeze, Jaime) Modified on 2/26/2020 (cmj).
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Order and Warrant Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. (Betbeze, Jaime) Modified on 2/26/2020 (cmj).
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. (Betbeze, Jaime)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #2 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons Affidavit That Defendant Cannot Be Found Within The District by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. (Betbeze, Jaime)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk to CAC Maritime (Betbeze, Jaime)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint Under Rule B of the Supplemental Rules Applicable to Admiralty against CAC Maritime ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2575032, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Betbeze, Jaime) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2020: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk v. CAC Maritime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baltic Beheer B. V. & D. van Urk
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAC Maritime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Stiegler Shipping Company, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?