Diamond v. Alabama U.S.
Plaintiff: Corey L. Diamond
Defendant: Alabama U.S.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00149
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE re: Making an Offer by Corey L. Diamond. (srd) Referred to Judge Granade.
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, prior to service of process, because Plaintiff's Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; that Plaintiff be extended leave to file an amended complaint; and finding #2 motion to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs to be MOOT. Plaintiff must file a new IFP motion if he files an amended complaint. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/23/2020. (mab) (copy to Pltf 4/24/2020) Modified on 4/24/2020 (mab).
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Corey L. Diamond. (Referred to MJ/Murray(PSU) (srd)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama U.S., filed by Corey L. Diamond. (srd) (Referred to MJ/Murray(PSU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond v. Alabama U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey L. Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?