Barganier et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Andrew Barganier and Camie Campbell Barganier
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and All In Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2020cv00151
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 REFERRAL OF #13 Reply Brief to Judge Steele. (cmj)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Andrew Barganier, Camie Campbell Barganier re: #12 Notice of Joinder, #11 Response to Motion filed by Andrew Barganier, Camie Campbell Barganier. (Underwood, Earl)
April 20, 2020 REFERRAL OF #12 Notice of Joinder to Judge Steele. (cmj)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Joinder by All In Federal Credit Union re: #11 Response to Motion (Elebash, William)
April 17, 2020 REFERRAL OF #11 Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Ford Motor Company. (Cannon, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by All In Federal Credit Union. (Elebash, William)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Andrew Barganier, Camie Campbell Barganier Responses due by 4/17/2020; Replies due by 4/24/2020; Motion to be taken under submission on 4/24/2020. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/6/20. (cmj)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Stay the Preliminary Scheduling Order #4 . A new one will be entered, if necessary, once the pending Motion to Remand has been ruled on. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/6/2020. (Milling, Bert)
April 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Stay re #4 Preliminary Scheduling Order Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (cmj)
April 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand to Judge Steele (cmj)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay re #4 Preliminary Scheduling Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Underwood, Earl)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchasse Agreement, #2 Exhibit CarFax Report) (Underwood, Earl)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Lee Elebash on behalf of All In Federal Credit Union (Elebash, William)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/27/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/13/20. (cmj)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company.. (Cannon, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Cannon, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL , filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Receipt number 46031052946, Fee Paid at Intake) (Cannon, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/12/2020 (meh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barganier et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cannon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All In Federal Credit Union
Represented By: William Lee Elebash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Barganier
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camie Campbell Barganier
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?