In the Matter of Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation
Petitioner: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00170
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, Directing Issuance of Notice & Restraining Prosecution of Claims. Filing of claims due 6/5/2020. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/9/2020. (Attachment: #1 Notice to Claimants) (tot)
March 23, 2020 REFERRAL OF #1 Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability to Judge Moorer. (tot)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by COOPER MARINE & TIMBERLANDS CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2590572, Online Credit Card Payment). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit W. T. Ames Affidavit, #2 Affidavit John Stokes Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Stipulation, #5 Text of Proposed Order Notice to Claimants) (Radcliff, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?