Nettles v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frank Nettles
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00240
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 09/04/2019. (srd)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Order, #3 Authorization) (srd)
April 24, 2020 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-01547. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER transferring case to another district: The motion to Transfer case to the Southern District of Alabama is GRANTED; original electronic record will be electronically to the Clerk of Court for the Southern District of Alabama 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/10/2020. (AHI ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Change Venue by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morrow, William) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICER OF REQUEST for Production of Documents by Frank Nettles. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Defendants)(Hoaglund, Eric) Modified on 3/18/2020 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 9/15/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2020; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 1/15/2021; Trial ready by 2/2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/10/2020. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Clinton Ray South terminated. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/04/2019. (KBW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Motion by BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company to Withdraw and Substitute Attorney by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Sewell, Robert) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by K Edward Sexton, II on behalf of Frank Nettles (Sexton, K) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/09/2019. (KBW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/09/2019. (KBW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 24 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Plaintiff and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.(South, Clinton) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 8, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3475149 (B4601101952). (Hoaglund, Eric) Modified on 11/12/2019 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 8, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3475134 (B4601101951). (Hoaglund, Eric) Modified on 11/12/2019 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frank Nettles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hoaglund, Eric) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frank Nettles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hoaglund, Eric) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Hoaglund on behalf of Frank Nettles (Hoaglund, Eric) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/5/2019. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, thisaction has been randomly reassigned to the Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:19-cv-1547-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(South, Clinton) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 10/21/2019. (SHB, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Keiler, and Georgia Lee Lucier are terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on September 30, 2019. (HKM, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. filed by BP Exploration & Production Inc (South, Clinton) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company. filed by BP America Production Company (South, Clinton) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw Motion is RIPE 9/30/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (South, Clinton) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Ray South on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (South, Clinton) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Enrique J Gimenez on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Gimenez, Enrique) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan Irby Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than November 4, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/18/19. (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/18/19. (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/18/19. (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10326. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/17/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/18/2019.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/18/2019.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/18/2019.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/18/2019.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/18/2019.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7636122) filed by Frank Nettles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nathan Lee Nelson added to party Frank Nettles(pty:pla).(Nelson, Nathan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/18/2019.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nettles v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Represented By: Robert Jackson Sewell
Represented By: Enrique J Gimenez
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Represented By: Robert Jackson Sewell
Represented By: Enrique J Gimenez
Represented By: Clinton Ray South
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Nettles
Represented By: Gabriel Hawa
Represented By: Eric D. Hoaglund
Represented By: K. Edward Sexton, II
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?