Gates v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tamela Gates
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00245
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Filing Int and RFP Responses from Plaintiff filed by Tamela Gates. (Montgomery, Patrick)
June 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 Joint MOTION for HIPAA Protective Order; and #15 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order, Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (mab)
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Protection) (Pryor, Caroline)
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order HIPAA filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed HIPAA Protective Order) (Pryor, Caroline)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Filing Int and RFP to Defendant filed by Tamela Gates. (Montgomery, Patrick)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Filing Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Tamela Gates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Montgomery, Patrick)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. Motions to amend pleadings due by 8/21/2020. Discovery cutoff 1/15/2021. Dispositive motions due by 1/22/2021. Jury Selection set for 4/27/2021 at 8:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Jury Trial set for the May 2021 term in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. ETT 2 days. Position Regarding Settlement due by 1/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 05/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (srd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Scheduling Conference held on 5/21/2020. (eec)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Deposition filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Pryor, Caroline)
May 8, 2020 Set Hearing: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray pursuant to order (Doc. 9). (mab)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: This cause is before the Court on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, filed May 7, 2020. (Doc. 8). This action shall come on for a Rule 16(b) scheduling conference on May 21, 2020, at 3:00 p.m., by telephone, as it is the undersigned's belief that bringing the parties and the Court together at this stage promotes efficiency in the litigation process, helps avoid discovery disputes, provides a clearer path to pretrial resolution, and allows counsel to pose questions to the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(1)(B) (providing that a magistrate judge must issue a scheduling order after consulting with the parties' attorneys... at a scheduling conference). Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants are directed to use the following numbers to call-in for the conference call: CALL IN: 877-873-8018 and ACCESS CODE: 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/7/20. (lto)
May 7, 2020 REFERRAL OF #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Murray. (mab)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Pryor, Caroline)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 04/29/2020. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: #2 Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal Documents Supplementing the Notice of Removal is GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/29/2020. (mab)
April 29, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to File Under Seal Documents Supplementing the Notice of Removal (Exhibits D & E) Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Ryan, Sarah)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Ryan, Sarah)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Ryan, Sarah)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2607756, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Ryan, Sarah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamela Gates
Represented By: Patrick Glenn Montgomery
Represented By: Patrick G. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Represented By: Sarah Cross Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?