Poarch Band of Creek Indians v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Poarch Band of Creek Indians
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Allergan Sales, LLC, Eastern Shore Neurology Clinic, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Thomas Justin Palmer, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., MD Rassan M Tarabein, Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc., Xiulu Ruan, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership II, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Bridgette Parker, Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Allergan Finance, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, MD John Patrick Couch, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00279
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Rockwell on behalf of Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C. (Rockwell, Thomas)
July 10, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T. Cobb Kaufman on behalf of Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C. (Kaufman, Kathleen)
July 10, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #38 MOTION for Thomas M. Galloway, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
July 10, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Thomas M. Galloway, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C., Xiulu Ruan. (Galloway, Thomas)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay. This action is stayed pending final decision by Judicial Panel on MDL as to whether this case will or will not be transferred to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio for MDL proceedings. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/7/20. (cmj)
June 26, 2020 REFERRAL OF #36 Reply to Judge Steele. (cmj)
June 26, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY to #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Sadler, Kevin)
June 25, 2020 REFERRAL OF #35 Reply, to Judge Steele. (cmj)
June 25, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to #17 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Turner, Sara)
June 25, 2020 REFERRAL OF #34 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
June 24, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Poarch Band of Creek Indians. (Frazer, Thomas)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Kevin M Sadler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/24/20. (ktw)
June 24, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T. Cobb Kaufman on behalf of Thomas Justin Palmer, Bridgette Parker (Kaufman, Kathleen)
June 23, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Rockwell on behalf of Thomas Justin Palmer, Bridgette Parker (Rockwell, Thomas)
June 23, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #30 MOTION and APPLICATION for Kevin M Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. G Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
June 23, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION and APPLICATION for Kevin M Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2633032, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Sadler, Kevin)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Scott D. Powers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/23/20. (ktw)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by David T. Arlington. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/23/20. (ktw)
June 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #27 MOTION and APPLICATION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala., #26 MOTION and APPLICATION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Al Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
June 22, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION and APPLICATION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2632460, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Powers, Scott)
June 22, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION and APPLICATION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2632448, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Arlington, David)
June 18, 2020 REFERRAL OF #25 Response to Judge Steele. (cmj)
June 17, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #23 Order,, Set Deadlines, #17 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Poarch Band of Creek Indians. (Frazer, Thomas)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Response to Motion due by 6/24/2020, Replies due by 7/1/2020, Motion to be taken under submission on 7/1/2020. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/10/20. (srr)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order re: #17 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc.; Response to Motion due by 6/18/2020, Replies due by 6/25/2020, Motion to be taken under submission on 6/25/2020. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/10/20. (srr)
June 11, 2020 REFERRAL OF #22 Reply Brief to Judge Steele. (nah)
June 10, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Poarch Band of Creek Indians re: #6 MOTION to Remand with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Motion for Expedited Ruling filed by Poarch Band of Creek Indians. (Frazer, Thomas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 21 Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #19 filed by Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (Steele, William)
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Endo International plc, Generics International (US), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Endo International plc, Other Affiliate Generics International (US), Inc. for Par Pharmaceutical Inc... (Turner, Sara)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Endo International plc, Generics International (US), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc, Other Affiliate Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Other Affiliate Generics International (US), Inc. for Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc... (Turner, Sara)
June 5, 2020 REFERRAL OF #18 Memorandum in Support, to Judge Steele. (cmj)
June 5, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation to Judge Steele (cmj)
June 4, 2020 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Turner, Sara)
June 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Turner, Sara)
June 4, 2020 REFERRAL OF #16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Motion for Expedited Ruling Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Endo Health Solutions Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Turner, Sara)
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #13 filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Steele, William)
May 27, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Steele (cmj)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Green, Wilson)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Green, Wilson)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP; Wal-Mart, Inc. (Steele, William)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Hargrove, Alan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #9 filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Steele, William)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Walker, Thomas)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Walker, Thomas)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #6 MOTION to Remand with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Motion for Expedited Ruling filed by Poarch Band of Creek Indians. Responses due by 6/3/2020; Replies due by 6/10/2020; Motion to be taken under submission on 6/10/2020. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/21/20. (cmj)
May 20, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Motion for Expedited Ruling to Judge Steele (cmj)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Motion for Expedited Ruling filed by Poarch Band of Creek Indians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Judge Polster's Opinion) (Frazer, Thomas)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The moving defendants must file their answer or responsive pleading to the Complaint no later than 30 days after the later of: (i) any decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation vacating the Conditional Transfer Order entered this morning or otherwise denying transfer; or (ii) a ruling by this Court on any motion to remand. Of course, if the transfer of this action to MDL No. 2804 is finalized, then the transferee court will enter appropriate orders fixing deadlines for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/20/20. (cmj)
May 20, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time Moving Defendants Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Judge Steele (cmj)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time Moving Defendants Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Turner, Sara)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Turner, Sara)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc... (Turner, Sara)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2616667, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Turner, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poarch Band of Creek Indians v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Shore Neurology Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Justin Palmer
Represented By: Thomas M. Rockwell
Represented By: Kathleen T. Cobb Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Rassan M Tarabein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co., Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiulu Ruan
Represented By: Thomas M. Galloway, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Wilson F. Green
Represented By: David T. Arlington
Represented By: Scott D. Powers
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Cason Michael Kirby
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Sela Stroud Blanton
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Nicholson
Represented By: Elizabeth Nicholson Terenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgette Parker
Represented By: Thomas M. Rockwell
Represented By: Kathleen T. Cobb Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Cason Michael Kirby
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD John Patrick Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Cason Michael Kirby
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald C. Swann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C.
Represented By: Thomas M. Galloway, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas M. Rockwell
Represented By: Kathleen T. Cobb Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Sela Stroud Blanton
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Nicholson
Represented By: Elizabeth Nicholson Terenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poarch Band of Creek Indians
Represented By: Thomas Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?