Evans v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marcille Evans
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00289
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order re: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Marcille Evans, ( Scheduling Conference, by telephone, set for 7/27/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/15/2020. (eec)
July 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #9 Notice of Endorsement of #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (mab)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Endorsement by Walmart Stores, Inc. re: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (DeLashmet, W.)
July 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (Note: need notice of endorsement from Attorney Delashmet) (mab)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Dasinger, Brian)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (DeLashmet, W.)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 This action has been transferred from the docket of William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Terry F. Moorer. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/28/2020. (eec)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Walmart Stores, Inc. (Cassady, William)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Walmart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L P identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L P for Walmart Stores, Inc... (DeLashmet, W.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2620765, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C) (DeLashmet, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcille Evans
Represented By: Brian A. Dassinger
Represented By: Brian Anton Dasinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?