Clayton v. Pacheco et al
Plaintiff: Marquis Cantrell Clayton
Defendant: Officer Foster, Alfie Pacheco, Sgt. Davis and Officer Dixon
Case Number: 1:2020cv00291
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Officer Dixon and Officer Foster. Officer Dixon waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (cmj)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alfie Pacheco. Alfie Pacheco waiver sent on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (cmj)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Lawsuit and REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Alfie Pacheco, Sgt. Davis, Officer Dixon and Officer Foster c/o Melissa Nelson on 6/23/20. Waiver of Service due by 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 request for waiver) (cmj)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s) in accordance with the Court's standing order dated February 1, 1994 paragraph a, b, or c. Special Report and Answer due within 60 days of mailing of waiver by Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/22/20. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Payment Prisoner Filing Fee. ADOC to collect payments pursuant to 28:1915(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/22/20. (copy to plaintiff, ADOC & bus mngr) (cmj)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk is to withhold service until further notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/29/20. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marquis Cantrell Clayton. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Sgt. Davis, Officer Dixon, Officer Foster, Alfie Pacheco, filed by Marquis Cantrell Clayton. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/25/2020; ref to Judge Murray/PSU. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. Pacheco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfie Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Cantrell Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?