Stewart v. Nelson
Plaintiff: James Walker Stewart
Defendant: Bryant Nelson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00295
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend Answer. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/22/20. (cmj)
July 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Amend Answer #8 Answer to Complaint Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bryant Nelson. (Walker, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Answer #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Bryant Nelson. (Walker, David)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/17/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/1/20. (cmj)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bryant Nelson. (Walker, David)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Walker Stewart. Bryant Nelson served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Briskman, Samuel)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Walker on behalf of Bryant Nelson (Walker, David)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Rutens on behalf of Bryant Nelson (Rutens, Andrew)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 6/3/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 7/17/2020.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/3/20. (cmj)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bryant Nelson. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by James Walker Stewart (Briskman, Samuel)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryant Nelson ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BALSDC-2623588, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by James Walker Stewart. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/31/2020. (Briskman, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Walker Stewart
Represented By: Samuel Joshua Briskman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Nelson
Represented By: David F. Walker
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?