Thomas v. Stewart
Plaintiff: Morris Jermaine Thomas
Defendant: Cynthia Stewart
Case Number: 1:2020cv00302
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Cynthia Stewart on 7/14/20 by Cynthia Stewart. Waiver of Service due by 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver) (cmj)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order for clerk to resend the Court's order (doc. 9), Notice of Waiver and this order to Cynthia Stewart. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/14/20. (order, doc. 9, waiver and complaint mailed to Cythia Stewart) (cmj)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Cynthia Stewart re #10 Request for Waiver of Service. Referred to MJ/Murray (PSU). (skb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Cynthia Stewart c/o Jennifer Parker on 6/23/20. Waiver of Service due by 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 request for waiver) (cmj)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s) in accordance with the Court's standing order dated February 1, 1994 paragraph a, b, or c. Special Report and Answer due within 60 days of mailing of waiver by Clerk.(copy to plaintiff, ADOC & defendant)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Payment Prisoner Filing Fee. ADOC to collect payments pursuant to 28:1915(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/22/20. (copy to plaintiff, ADOC & business manager) (cmj)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to withhold service until further notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/16/20. (cmj) (copy mailed to plaintiff)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Morris Jermaine Thomas.Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (skb)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/5/20. (docs 4, 5 and IFP motion mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order denying #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Morris Jermaine Thomas as it is not on the Court's form. Plaintiff to file Court's form IFP with inmate account as set out. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 6/26/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/5/20. (cmj)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Morris Jermaine Thomas. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (skb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Morris Jermaine Thomas. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (skb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Cynthia Stewart filed by Morris Jermaine Thomas. Referred to MJ/Murray (PSU). (skb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Jermaine Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?