Prudential Mutual Fund Services LLC v. Meredith et al
Plaintiff: Prudential Mutual Fund Services LLC
Defendant: Olen Meredith, Robert Meredith, Paul Meredith, The Estate of Alma Ruth Meredith and Paul Michael Meredith
Case Number: 1:2020cv00309
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
2 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 Paul Meredith's ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim against Prudential, Answer to Olen Meredith's Claim ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Robert Meredith and Olen Meredith against All Parties, COUNTERCLAIM against All Parties by Paul Michael Meredith. (Meredith, Paul)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/27/20. (cmj)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Deposit Funds. PMFS shall deposit with the Clerk of Court funds, as set out. The amount shall be deposited into the Court's Disputed Ownership Fund. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/24/20. (cmj)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint and CLAIM by Olen Meredith. (Friedlander, Nathan) Modified on 7/27/2020 (cmj).
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Felicia A. Long (Long, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #5 MOTION to Deposit Funds and Related Relief With Supporting Brief filed by Prudential Mutual Fund Services LLC. Objections/Responses due by 7/22/2020. If no objections are filed, the motion will be granted. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/8/20. (cmj)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance by Nathan Friedlander on behalf of Olen Meredith, The Estate of Alma Ruth Meredith. (Friedlander, Nathan) Modified on 6/26/2020 (cmj).
June 23, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Deposit Funds and Related Relief With Supporting Brief to Judge Beaverstock. (mbp)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on Disclosure Statement filed by Prudential Mutual Fund Services LLC (Doc. 1-8). A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/23/2020. (ctn)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (srr)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Magistrate Judge, please use the letter suffix N after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds and Related Relief With Supporting Brief filed by Prudential Mutual Fund Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Long, Felicia)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Prudential Mutual Fund Services LLC Amended Civil Cover Sheet indicating Corrected Nature of Suit as 190-Other Contract (Long, Felicia)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Olen Meredith, Paul Meredith, Robert Meredith, The Estate of Alma Ruth Meredith. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2626428, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Prudential Mutual Fund Services LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Olen Meredith, #5 Summons - Estate of Alma Ruth Meredith, #6 Summons - Paul Meredith, #7 Summons - Robert Meredith, #8 Conflict Page Conflict Disclosure Statement) (Long, Felicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential Mutual Fund Services LLC v. Meredith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Mutual Fund Services LLC
Represented By: Felicia A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olen Meredith
Represented By: Nathan P. Friedlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Alma Ruth Meredith
Represented By: Nathan P. Friedlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Michael Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?