Johnson v. Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosheba Thomas Johnson
Defendant: Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc. and Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc. doing business as Pennington Transportation Service
Case Number: 1:2020cv00329
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: This cause is before the Court on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, filed August 14, 2020. (Doc. 5). This action shall come on for a Rule 16(b) scheduling conference on September 3, 2020, at 3:00 p.m., by telephone, as it is the undersigned's belief that bringing the parties and the Court together at this stage promotes efficiency in the litigation process, helps avoid discovery disputes, provides a clearer path to pretrial resolution, and allows counsel to pose questions to the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(1)(B) (providing that a magistrate judge must issue a scheduling order after consulting with the parties' attorneys... at a scheduling conference.). Counsel shall attend the scheduling conference by telephone by using the following numbers to call-in for the conference call: CALL IN NO.: 877-873-8018 and ACCESS CODE: 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/17/20. (lto)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Defendant Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
August 17, 2020 Set Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. See call in information at doc. 7. (cmj)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Reeves, Grady)
August 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Murray. (cmj)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/14/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/30/20. (cmj)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc.. (Reeves, Grady)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc.. (Reeves, Grady)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 46031053732, Fee Paid at Intake) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Reeves, Grady) Modified on 6/26/2020 (cmj). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Grady A. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc. doing business as Pennington Transportation Service
Represented By: Grady A. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosheba Thomas Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Moak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?